Harakeke Investments Limited (NZBN 9429041891216) was registered on 07 Aug 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 85 Harakeke Street, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014 (type: physical, service). 96 Shands Road, Hornby South, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 18 Jun 2020. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 30 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Ellis, Angela Marie (a director) located at Fendalton, Christchurch postcode 8014. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 70% of all shares (exactly 70 shares); it includes
Ellis, Matthew Warrington (a director) - located at Fendalton, Christchurch. "Investment - commercial property" (ANZSIC L671230) is the category the ABS issued to Harakeke Investments Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
85 Harakeke Street, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014 | Physical & service & registered | 18 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Angela Marie Ellis
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 10 Jun 2020
Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 07 Aug 2015 - current |
Matthew Warrington Ellis
Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 10 Jun 2020
Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 27 Nov 2015 |
Director | 07 Aug 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
96 Shands Road, Hornby South, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered | 07 Dec 2015 - 18 Jun 2020 |
85 Harakeke Street, Fendalton, Christchurch, 8014 | Physical & registered | 07 Aug 2015 - 07 Dec 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ellis, Angela Marie Director |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
07 Aug 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ellis, Matthew Warrington Director |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
07 Aug 2015 - current |
Flagstaff Recruitment Limited 96 Shands Road |
|
Kerbco Limited 96 Shands Road |
|
Synergy Health Solutions Limited 96 Shands Road |
|
Synergy Health International Limited 96 Shands Road |
|
Laurenson Landscaping Limited 96 Shands Road |
|
Kaizen Advisory Limited 96 Shands Road |
Chinook Holdings Limited 3 Chinook Place |
Park & Loh Investments Company Limited 21 Foremans Road |
Napoleon Properties Limited 533 Halswell Junction Road |
Flying Ace Investment Limited 25 Mckellar Place |
Wxz Limited Unit 5 91 Waterloo Road |
Mg Group Holdings Limited 78 Waterloo Road |