Healthsafe Nz Limited (issued a business number of 9429041958155) was registered on 11 Sep 2015. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 697C, Wairere Drive, Hamilton, 3210 (type: registered, service). 7963 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 2201 shares (27.64% of shares). Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (470 shares, 5.9%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Tuibenau, Eparama, located at Grey Lynn, Auckland (an individual). "Occupational safety and health (OSH) consultancy service" (business classification M696260) is the category the ABS issued to Healthsafe Nz Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
21 Listack Drive, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019 | Other (Address For Share Register) & registered & physical & service & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 11 Sep 2015 |
697c, Wairere Drive, Hamilton, 3210 | Registered & service | 11 Apr 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Joseph Mcafee
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 11 Sep 2015 |
Director | 11 Sep 2015 - current |
Tammy Anne Hurst
Rd 1, Raglan, 3295
Address used since 01 Apr 2022 |
Director | 01 Apr 2022 - current |
James Benjamin Henry Hurst
Rd 1, Raglan, 3295
Address used since 15 Mar 2023 |
Director | 15 Mar 2023 - current |
Rory John Macgillycuddy
Rd 2, Helensville, 0875
Address used since 01 Aug 2023 |
Director | 01 Aug 2023 - current |
Kevin Joseph Mc Afee
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 11 Sep 2015 |
Director | 11 Sep 2015 - 01 Aug 2023 |
James Henry Yearsley
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 21 Jul 2020
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 11 Oct 2019 |
Director | 11 Oct 2019 - 01 Jun 2022 |
21 Listack Drive , Flat Bush , Auckland , 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yearsley, Maxine Jo-anne Individual |
18 Jul 2024 - current | |
Yearsley, James Henry Individual |
18 Jul 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yearsley, Maxine Jo-anne Individual |
18 Jul 2024 - current | |
Yearsley, James Henry Individual |
18 Jul 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tuibenau, Eparama Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
31 Jan 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hulme, Nicholas Individual |
Varsity Lakes Queensland 4227 |
05 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yggdrasil Capital Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047104266 Company Number: 7097033 Entity |
Hamilton 3210 |
15 Oct 2019 - 18 Jul 2024 |
Yggdrasil Capital Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047104266 Company Number: 7097033 Entity |
Hamilton 3210 |
15 Oct 2019 - 18 Jul 2024 |
Mcafee, Kevin Joseph Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
11 Sep 2015 - 08 Dec 2023 |
Transcend Investment Limited 15 Listack Drive |
|
Gemdale Limited 33 Springside Drive |
|
Wu And Lieu Holding Limited 170 Flat Bush School Road |
|
Rgsg Mangat Limited 174 Flat Bush School Road |
|
H & Y Auckland Limited 10 Cahir Place |
|
Hua Xiang Homes Limited 145 Flat Bush School Road |
Allen Hedley Limited 48 Delmont Close |
Hse Consultants & Solutions Limited 7 Giani Court |
Ecoshare New Zealand Limited 44 Dalgety Drive |
Has Expertise Limited 9 Raewyn Place |
Frisch Limited L8 Southern Cross Building |
Occupational Health Services Auckland Limited 21 Woodgers Way |