Mcdonald Four Limited (issued a business number of 9429041992920) was registered on 24 Sep 2015. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 203 Karamu Road North, Hastings, Hastings, 4122 (type: registered, service). Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 11 Aug 2021. Mcdonald Four Limited used more aliases, namely: Md Trustee Company 63 Limited from 23 Sep 2015 to 21 Jun 2016. 300 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 300 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Newson, Ross Alexander (a director) located at Wilton, Wellington postcode 6012. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & service & registered | 11 Aug 2021 |
203 Karamu Road North, Hastings, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & service | 19 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ross Alexander Newson
Wilton, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 24 Jul 2024 |
Director | 24 Jul 2024 - current |
David Hugh Mcdonald
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 10 Apr 2024 |
Director | 10 Apr 2024 - 24 Jul 2024 |
Matthew James Underwood
Brooklyn, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 20 Apr 2018
Thorndon, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 24 Sep 2015 |
Director | 24 Sep 2015 - 10 Apr 2024 |
Lance Thomas Burgess
Maymorn, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 24 Sep 2015 |
Director | 24 Sep 2015 - 31 Mar 2016 |
John William Little
Miramar, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 24 Sep 2015 |
Director | 24 Sep 2015 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 12 Sep 2017 - 11 Aug 2021 |
Level 6, Panama House, 22 Panama Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 29 Jul 2016 - 12 Sep 2017 |
Level 5, 203-209 Willis Street, Wellington, 6142 | Registered & physical | 24 Sep 2015 - 29 Jul 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Newson, Ross Alexander Director |
Wilton Wellington 6012 |
24 Jul 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcdonald, David Hugh Individual |
Hastings Hastings 4122 |
10 Apr 2024 - 24 Jul 2024 |
Underwood, Matthew James Individual |
Brooklyn Wellington 6021 |
24 Sep 2015 - 10 Apr 2024 |
Burgess, Lance Thomas Individual |
Maymorn Upper Hutt 5018 |
24 Sep 2015 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Lance Thomas Burgess Director |
Maymorn Upper Hutt 5018 |
24 Sep 2015 - 31 Mar 2016 |
John William Little Director |
Miramar Wellington 6022 |
24 Sep 2015 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Little, John William Individual |
Miramar Wellington 6022 |
24 Sep 2015 - 31 Mar 2016 |
Assure Legal Limited Level 1, 79 Taranaki Street |
|
B+lnz Genetics Limited Level 4, 154 Featherston Street |
|
Ignition Films Limited Level 4, 111 Customhouse Quay |
|
Stewart Baillie Limited Level 3, 44 Victoria Street |
|
Tbfree New Zealand Limited Level 9, 15 Willeston Street |
|
Ospri New Zealand Limited Level 9, 15 Willeston Street |