Box People Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429042016410) was incorporated on 12 Oct 2015. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 47168, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1144 (type: postal, office). Suite 1.2, 317 New North Road, Kingsland, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 05 May 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Box Living Group Limited (an entity) located at Ponsonby, Auckland postcode 1011. "Business administrative service" (business classification N729110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Box People Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit B, 1 Jervois Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical & service | 05 May 2022 |
Po Box 47168, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1144 | Postal | 06 Oct 2022 |
Unit B, 1 Jervois Road, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011 | Office & delivery | 06 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nathaniel Christie Holloway
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 27 Mar 2023
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 12 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Oct 2015 - current |
Nathaniel Jakich
Oratia, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 12 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Oct 2015 - current |
Dan Heyworth
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 12 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Oct 2015 - current |
Christopher Watt
Titirangi, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 01 Jun 2019 |
Director | 01 Jun 2019 - 01 Jan 2020 |
Timothy David Dorrington
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 12 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Oct 2015 - 16 May 2019 |
Darryl Vaughan Dorrington
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Oct 2015 |
Director | 12 Oct 2015 - 11 May 2017 |
Unit B, 1 Jervois Road , Ponsonby , Auckland , 1011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 1.2, 317 New North Road, Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 12 Oct 2015 - 05 May 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Box Living Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041993088 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
12 Oct 2015 - current |
Name | Box Living Group Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 5807472 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Studio 1.2, 317 New North Road Kingsland Auckland 1021 |
Mount Base Vineyards Limited 317 New North Road |
|
Tiger Tiger Limited 317 New North Road |
|
Imf Holdings Limited 331 New North Road |
|
Substance NZ Limited 331 New North Road |
|
Knowear Limited 331 New North Road |
|
Fredco Motors (1997) Limited 310 New North Road |
Digimaster Limited 2-4, 72 Dominion Road |
Merric Limited 21 Kowhai Street |
Aplus Management Group Limited 1 New North Road |
G.p. Sawdoctors Limited Unit G12 23 Edwin Street |
Covallina Investments Limited 8 Normanby Road |
Side Lines Limited 102 / 9 Hopetoun Street |