Cliftons Operations Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429042056911) was registered on 24 Nov 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 86 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: physical, service). Level 3, 86 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their physical address, until 20 Oct 2022. Cliftons Operations Limited used more aliases, namely: Chancery Lane Holdings Limited from 26 Nov 2015 to 23 Nov 2021, Chancery Chambers Limited (05 Nov 2015 to 26 Nov 2015). 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Apples & Pears Entertainment Group Limited (an other) located at 40-44 Wyndham Street, Central Hong Kong. "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250) is the category the ABS issued to Cliftons Operations Limited. Our data was last updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 86 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & service & registered | 20 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew David Cameron
Bellevue Hill, Sydney/nsw, 2023
Address used since 07 Jul 2022
Sydney, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Toorak, Victoria, 3142
Address used since 05 Dec 2016
Rosebay, Sydney, 2029
Address used since 05 Jul 2018
Sydney, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 24 Nov 2015 - current |
David Gareth Schofield
Panmure, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 24 Nov 2015 |
Director | 24 Nov 2015 - 15 Dec 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 86 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered | 11 Jul 2019 - 20 Oct 2022 |
2 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 24 Nov 2015 - 11 Jul 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Apples & Pears Entertainment Group Limited Other (Other) |
40-44 Wyndham Street Central Hong Kong |
24 Nov 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Schofield, David Gareth Individual |
Panmure Auckland 1072 |
24 Nov 2015 - 21 Dec 2016 |
David Gareth Schofield Director |
Panmure Auckland 1072 |
24 Nov 2015 - 21 Dec 2016 |
Effective Date | 30 Jun 2019 |
Name | Apples And Pears Entertainment Group Limited |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1086712 |
Country of origin | HK |
Address |
6f. Wyndham Place 40-44 Wyndham Street Central Hong Kong |
Solera Limited 2 Crummer Road |
|
Cwm No1 Trustee Limited 2 Crummer Road |
|
Scott Campbell Treasury Services Limited 2 Crummer Road |
|
Maa Holdings Limited 2 Crummer Road |
|
Parnell Apartments (2013) Limited 2 Crummer Road |
|
Mdtt Property Investment Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Trf Group Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Park Avenue Properties Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Nesi Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Dph Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Arjay Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Valiant Investments Limited 2 Crummer Road |