Monowai Ecological Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042058083) was launched on 09 Nov 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 7 Brick Hill Road, Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023 (type: registered, service). 29 Station Road, Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers had been their registered address, up until 28 Mar 2024. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Thomson, Matthew James (a director) located at Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers postcode 9023. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Keating, Michelle Mary (a director) - located at Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers. "Forest conservation services" (business classification A051020) is the category the ABS issued Monowai Ecological Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 28 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Station Road, Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023 | Physical | 02 Sep 2022 |
7 Brick Hill Road, Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023 | Registered & service | 28 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michelle Mary Keating
Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 20 Mar 2024
Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 25 Aug 2022
Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 06 Mar 2020
Mount Cargill, Waitati, 9085
Address used since 09 Nov 2015 |
Director | 09 Nov 2015 - current |
Matthew James Thomson
Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 20 Mar 2024
Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 15 Mar 2023
Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023
Address used since 06 Mar 2020
Mount Cargill, Waitati, 9085
Address used since 09 Nov 2015 |
Director | 09 Nov 2015 - current |
20 Fairview Terrace , Sawyers Bay , Port Chalmers , 9023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
29 Station Road, Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023 | Registered & service | 02 Sep 2022 - 28 Mar 2024 |
20 Fairview Terrace, Sawyers Bay, Port Chalmers, 9023 | Registered & physical | 16 Mar 2020 - 02 Sep 2022 |
290 Mount Cargill Road, Mount Cargill, Waitati, 9085 | Physical & registered | 09 Nov 2015 - 16 Mar 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomson, Matthew James Director |
Sawyers Bay Port Chalmers 9023 |
09 Nov 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Keating, Michelle Mary Director |
Sawyers Bay Port Chalmers 9023 |
09 Nov 2015 - current |
Trainor Electrical Limited 105 Hall Road |
|
Highland Glen Limited 353 Mount Cargill Road |
|
Emmaus Investments Limited 355 Mount Cargill Road |
|
Medwyn Holdings Limited 186 Reservoir Road |
|
Aml Consultants Limited 8 Tewsley Street |
|
Riskcalculus Limited 8 Tewsley Street |
Mammalian Corrections Unit Limited 52 Corstorphine Road |
Kiwicentric 2018 Limited 188 Stone Street |
Mixed Timber Forests Limited 28 Voelas Road |
Smart Farms Limited 71 Kings Road |
Blue Jeans Limited 71 Kings Road |
NZ Native Forest Cpr Limited 83b Ingram Road |