Nz Trustees International Limited (NZBN 9429042125396) was started on 21 Dec 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, until 15 Jun 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Cone, Geoffrey Peter (a director) located at Br Balneario Santa Monica, Loc La Barra, Maldonado. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 13 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Geoffrey Peter Cone
Br Balneario Santa Monica, Loc La Barra, Maldonado,
Address used since 21 Dec 2015 |
Director | 21 Dec 2015 - current |
Claire Judith Cooke
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 10 Oct 2018 |
Director | 10 Oct 2018 - current |
Alexandra Helen Neal
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 29 Dec 2023 |
Director | 29 Dec 2023 - current |
Brent Norman Wicks
Gulf Harbour, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 29 Dec 2023 |
Director | 29 Dec 2023 - current |
Claudia Shan
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 10 Oct 2018 |
Director | 10 Oct 2018 - 19 Feb 2024 |
Karen Anne Marshall
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Dec 2019
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 21 Dec 2015 |
Director | 21 Dec 2015 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 21 Dec 2015 - 15 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cone, Geoffrey Peter Director |
Br Balneario Santa Monica, Loc La Barra Maldonado |
21 Dec 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Marshall, Karen Anne Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
21 Dec 2015 - 20 May 2022 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |