Minerva Trustee Company Limited (issued a business number of 9429042204886) was registered on 24 Feb 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 21A Jason Avenue, Sandringham, Auckland, 1041 (type: registered, physical). 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Ayres, Warwick Richard (a director) located at Herne Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Newlove, Pamela Lorraine Elizabeth (a director) located at Sandringham, Auckland postcode 1041. "Investment operation - own account" (business classification K624060) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Minerva Trustee Company Limited. Our data was last updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
21a Jason Avenue, Sandringham, Auckland, 1041 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Feb 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Pamela Lorraine Elizabeth Newlove
Sandringham, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 24 Feb 2016 |
Director | 24 Feb 2016 - current |
Warwick Richard Ayres
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 14 Jun 2021 |
Director | 14 Jun 2021 - current |
Eugene Francis Sparrow
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 24 Feb 2016 |
Director | 24 Feb 2016 - 14 Jun 2021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ayres, Warwick Richard Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
16 Jun 2021 - current |
Newlove, Pamela Lorraine Elizabeth Director |
Sandringham Auckland 1041 |
24 Feb 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sparrow, Eugene Francis Individual |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
24 Feb 2016 - 16 Jun 2021 |
Niue Newton Community Trust 14 Mars Avenue |
|
Letterkenny Contractors Limited 16 Jason Avenue |
|
Daniel Browne Limited 16 Jason Avenue |
|
Williams Wilkinson Limited 17 Mars Avenue |
|
Cadence Telecommunications Limited 15 Mars Avenue |
|
Islands Universal Theatre Trust 1/10 Jason Avenue, |
Ying NZ Limited 9a Foch Avenue |
Merlot Traders Limited 28 Aurora Avenue |
Lms Trustee Limited 7 Bank Street |
Turner Airships Limited 809 New North Road |
Sherriff Investments Limited 7 Glenalmond Rd Mt Eden` |
Saunung Family Trustees Limited Suite 2-4, 72 Dominion Road |