Under Construction Limited (NZBN 9429042292906) was registered on 12 Apr 2016. 8 addresess are in use by the company: 40 Pampas Drive, Milldale, Auckland, 0992 (type: registered, service). Level 8, 44 Wellesley Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 05 Nov 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Martin, Bruce William (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Bennett, Daniel Vincent (a director) - located at Herne Bay, Auckland. "Building, house construction" (business classification E301120) is the category the ABS issued to Under Construction Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Shamrock Drive, Kumeu, Kumeu, 0810 | Office | 28 May 2019 |
Po Box 456, Kumeu, Kumeu, 0841 | Postal | 28 May 2019 |
8 Shamrock Drive, Kumeu, Kumeu, 0810 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Nov 2019 |
40 Pampas Drive, Milldale, Auckland, 0992 | Postal & office | 17 May 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce William Martin
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 17 May 2023
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 07 May 2021
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 31 May 2018
One Tree Point, One Tree Point, 0118
Address used since 12 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 Apr 2016 - current |
Daniel Vincent Bennett
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 07 May 2021
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 28 May 2019
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 Apr 2016 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
40 Pampas Drive, Milldale, Auckland, 0992 | Postal & office | 17 May 2023 |
40 Pampas Drive, Milldale, Auckland, 0992 | Registered & service | 25 May 2023 |
8 Shamrock Drive , Kumeu , Kumeu , 0810 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 8, 44 Wellesley Street, Auckland, 1141 | Registered & physical | 25 May 2017 - 05 Nov 2019 |
Level 8, Wellesley Street, Auckland, 1141 | Registered & physical | 12 Apr 2016 - 25 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin, Bruce William Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
12 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bennett, Daniel Vincent Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1022 |
12 Apr 2016 - current |
David Davies & Associates Limited Level 10, Novell Building |
|
Jasper Calder Charity Fund Or Trust Board 48 Wellesley Street West |
|
City Forex (nz) Limited Shop 3, 44 Wellesley Street |
|
City New Zealand Limited No 3, G/f, 44-52 Wellesley Street West |
|
Jpgsm Limited Level 10, Wellesley Centre |
Y & C Trustees Limited Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building |
Alaska Construction Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
Shaker 2007 Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
Rabo Construct Limited Level 8, 55 Shortland Street |
Jacks Point Developments No. 1 Limited Level 3, 18 Shortland Street |
Blackswamp Holdings Limited Level 3, 18 Shortland Street |