Rintoul Family Trustee Limited (issued a business number of 9429042347088) was registered on 12 May 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 580 Neems Road, Rd 1, Tinopai, 0593 (type: registered, physical). 634 Kara Road, Rd 9, Whangarei had been their registered address, up to 11 Sep 2019. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 49 shares (49 per cent of shares), namely:
Rintoul, Trevor Murray (a director) located at Rd 1, Tinopai postcode 0593. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49 per cent of all shares (exactly 49 shares); it includes
Rintoul, Lawrin Eileen (a director) - located at Tikipunga, Whangarei. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (2 shares, 2%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Johnston, Craig Maurice, located at One Tree Point, One Tree Point (an individual). "Mixed livestock farming nec" (ANZSIC A019975) is the category the ABS issued Rintoul Family Trustee Limited. Our data was updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
580 Neems Road, Rd 1, Tinopai, 0593 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Trevor Murray Rintoul
Rd 1, Tinopai, 0593
Address used since 03 Sep 2019
Rd 2, Matakohe, 0594
Address used since 21 Sep 2017
Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 16 Sep 2018
Rd 2, Ruawai, 0592
Address used since 12 May 2016 |
Director | 12 May 2016 - current |
Lawrin Eileen Rintoul
Tikipunga, Whangarei, 0112
Address used since 03 Sep 2019
Rd 2, Matakohe, 0592
Address used since 21 Sep 2017
Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179
Address used since 16 Sep 2018
Rd 2, Ruawai, 0592
Address used since 12 May 2016 |
Director | 12 May 2016 - current |
580 Neems Road , Rd 1 , Tinopai , 0593 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
634 Kara Road, Rd 9, Whangarei, 0179 | Registered & physical | 24 Sep 2018 - 11 Sep 2019 |
245 Page Road, Rd 2, Matakohe, 0594 | Registered & physical | 29 Sep 2017 - 24 Sep 2018 |
1129 Oparakau Road, Rd 2, Ruawai, 0592 | Registered & physical | 12 May 2016 - 29 Sep 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rintoul, Trevor Murray Director |
Rd 1 Tinopai 0593 |
12 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rintoul, Lawrin Eileen Director |
Tikipunga Whangarei 0112 |
12 May 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Johnston, Craig Maurice Individual |
One Tree Point One Tree Point 0118 |
12 May 2016 - current |
Jtm Enterprises Limited 250 Page Road |
|
Blisland Farm Limited 393 Birch Road |
Blisland Farm Limited 393 Birch Road |
Taringamutu Farms Limited 290 Hillcrest Road |
Wrennall Johnston Farms Limited 2573 Paparoa-oakleigh Road |
Parahi Outlet Road Limited 304 Paparoa Road |
Pinaki Station Limited 215 Pinaki Road |
Te Opu Creek Limited 104 Marohemo Road |