Billy Billy Limited (issued a business number of 9429042366485) was started on 27 May 2016. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 51 Peach Road, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 (type: registered, physical). 79 Carlton Gore Road, New Market, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 07 Oct 2020. 2 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (50% of shares), namely:
Saengngam, Tanaphoom (a director) located at Glenfield, Auckland postcode 0629. "Cafe operation" (ANZSIC H451110) is the category the ABS issued to Billy Billy Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
79 Carlton Gore Road, New Market, Auckland, 1023 | Postal & office & delivery | 08 May 2019 |
51 Peach Road, Glenfield, Auckland, 0629 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tanaphoom Saengngam
Glenfield, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 29 Sep 2020
Auckland, 1024
Address used since 29 Apr 2019 |
Director | 29 Apr 2019 - current |
Saruttaya Hongthong
Glenfield, Auckland, 0629
Address used since 29 Sep 2020
Newmarket, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 27 Jun 2017 |
Director | 27 May 2016 - 01 Oct 2023 |
Chalidaporn Srikrungkrai
Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 27 May 2016 |
Director | 27 May 2016 - 27 Jun 2017 |
79 Carlton Gore Road , New Market , Auckland , 1023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
79 Carlton Gore Road, New Market, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 05 Jul 2017 - 07 Oct 2020 |
3 Stephen Lysnar Place, Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042 | Registered | 27 May 2016 - 05 Jul 2017 |
79 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical | 27 May 2016 - 05 Jul 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Saengngam, Tanaphoom Director |
Glenfield Auckland 0629 |
05 Jun 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hongthong, Saruttaya Individual |
Glenfield Auckland 0629 |
27 May 2016 - 18 Oct 2023 |
Srikrungkrai, Chalidaporn Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
27 May 2016 - 27 Jun 2017 |
Chalidaporn Srikrungkrai Director |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
27 May 2016 - 27 Jun 2017 |
Twentyfive 7 Limited Levle 2, Fidelity House |
|
Soccer Plus New Zealand Charitable Trust M G I Wilson Eliott Ltd |
|
Incisive Limited Level , Fidelity House |
|
S.e Robinson Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
|
Erobinson Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
|
Parker Corp. Global Aspirations Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
L'atelier Du Fromage Limited 5 Mccoll Street |
Working Fathers Limited Suite 2, 8 Osborne Street |
Remmer's Cafe Limited 39 Park Road |
Chonticha Limited Level 6, 130 Broadway |
Beon Limited 713/26 Remuera Rd Newmarket |
The Deck Cafe Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |