Lusso Kitchens Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429042426295) was incorporated on 27 Jun 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 1, 136 Greenlane East, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 (type: registered, physical). Level 10, 33 Federal Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 23 May 2022. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Madagascar Security Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 136 Greenlane East, Greenlane, Auckland postcode 1051. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Whiteman, Carl (a director) - located at Murrays Bay, Auckland. "Furniture retailing" (business classification G421150) is the classification the ABS issued Lusso Kitchens Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
136 Green Lane East, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Postal & office & delivery | 06 May 2019 |
Level 1, 136 Greenlane East, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 23 May 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl Whiteman
Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 27 Jun 2016 |
Director | 27 Jun 2016 - current |
136 Green Lane East , Greenlane , Auckland , 1051 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 10, 33 Federal Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2020 - 23 May 2022 |
52 Swanson Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 27 Jun 2016 - 13 May 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Madagascar Security Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041033814 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
136 Greenlane East, Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
27 Jun 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whiteman, Carl Director |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 |
19 Jul 2022 - current |
Effective Date | 12 May 2022 |
Name | Madagascar Security Trustees Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 4854479 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 10 52 Swanson Street Auckland 1010 |
Fotc NZ Limited Partnership C/o Pieter Holl & Associates Ltd |
|
Buxton Gore Bay No.5 Limited Level 3, 14 Viaduct Harbour Ave |
|
Buxton Gore Bay No.1 Limited Level 3, 14 Viaduct Harbour Ave |
|
Wilson Consumer Products Limited Hobson Tower West |
|
Kls Holdings Limited Hobson Towers West |
Country Theme (auckland) Limited Level 4, Smith & Caughey Bldg |
Freshbooks Limited Level 12, 17 Albert Street |
Cuchi Limited 55 The Strand |
Matisse (auckland) Limited 99 The Strand |
Neospace International Limited 99 The Strand |
Rem Design Limited 2c/1 Tika Street |