Westpac New Zealand Staff Superannuation Scheme Trustee Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042437635) was started on 30 Jun 2016. 6 addresess are in use by the company: Flat 4A Waikite Apartments, 255 The Terrace, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (type: delivery, postal). Westpac New Zealand, Level 13, 318 Lambton Quay, Wellington had been their physical address, up to 05 Nov 2020. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Westpac Nz Operations Limited (an entity) located at 16 Takutai Square, Auckland postcode 1010. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Westpac New Zealand Staff Superannuation Scheme Trustee Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1143 | Office | 09 Jul 2019 |
Level 2, 20 Customhouse Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 05 Nov 2020 |
Westpac New Zealand, Level 15, 318 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery | 06 Jul 2021 |
Pwc Tower, 15 Custom Street West, Auckland, 1010 | Postal | 05 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce John Kerr
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 03 Jul 2020
225 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 30 Jun 2016
255 The Terrace, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 09 Jul 2019 |
Director | 30 Jun 2016 - current |
Ian Nicholas New
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 30 Jun 2016 |
Director | 30 Jun 2016 - current |
Marc David Figgins
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 08 Sep 2020 |
Director | 08 Sep 2020 - current |
Shelley Clare Powell
Stonefields, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 12 Apr 2022 |
Director | 12 Apr 2022 - current |
Brendon Mark Johnston
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 12 Apr 2022 |
Director | 12 Apr 2022 - current |
Tania Talei O'brien
Belmont, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 02 May 2022 |
Director | 02 May 2022 - current |
Grant David Hassell
Pukawa, Turangi, 3353
Address used since 01 Nov 2023 |
Director | 01 Nov 2023 - current |
Timothy Patrick Mcguinness
Tawa, Wellington, 5028
Address used since 15 Jul 2020
Tawa, Wellington, 5028
Address used since 14 Jul 2016 |
Director | 14 Jul 2016 - 13 Dec 2023 |
Liam David Cleary
Rd 3, Riverhead, 0793
Address used since 15 Jul 2020
Rd 3, Riverhead, 0793
Address used since 01 Mar 2019 |
Director | 01 Mar 2019 - 12 Apr 2022 |
Mark Broughton Weenink
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Oct 2018 |
Director | 01 Oct 2018 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Joanna Lyn Mcgregor
Orakei, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 15 Jul 2020
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 30 Jun 2016 |
Director | 30 Jun 2016 - 31 Mar 2021 |
Gina Dellabarca
Marshland, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 30 Jun 2016 |
Director | 30 Jun 2016 - 05 Jun 2020 |
Marc Hugh Nansen Proctor
Wai O Taiki Bay, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 30 Jun 2016 |
Director | 30 Jun 2016 - 01 Mar 2019 |
Simon James Power
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 30 Jun 2016 |
Director | 30 Jun 2016 - 01 Oct 2018 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Pwc Tower, 15 Custom Street West, Auckland, 1010 | Postal | 05 Jul 2022 |
Flat 4a Waikite Apartments, 255 The Terrace, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Delivery | 08 Aug 2023 |
Level 18, 151 Queen Street , Auckland , 1143 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Westpac New Zealand, Level 13, 318 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 22 Jul 2019 - 05 Nov 2020 |
Westpac New Zealand, Level 13, 318 Lambton Quay, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 17 Jul 2019 - 22 Jul 2019 |
Westpac On Takutai Square, 53 Galway Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 30 Jun 2016 - 17 Jul 2019 |
Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1143 | Registered | 30 Jun 2016 - 05 Nov 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Westpac NZ Operations Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033901022 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
16 Takutai Square Auckland 1010 |
15 Jul 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Westpac NZ Operations Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033901022 Company Number: 1859985 Entity |
16 Takutai Square Auckland 1010 |
30 Jun 2016 - 15 Jul 2020 |
Westpac NZ Operations Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033901022 Company Number: 1859985 Entity |
16 Takutai Square Auckland 1010 |
30 Jun 2016 - 15 Jul 2020 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Westpac Banking Corporation |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 91524515 |
Country of origin | AU |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
Hatton Trustee Services Limited Level 4, 21 Queen Street |
Manahau Properties Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
Kc Farms Trustee Limited Level 14, 41 Shortland Street |
Moore Park Trustee Limited 126 Vincent Street, Level 10 |
Gryphon Eight Investments Limited Level 7, 55 Shortland Street |