Astar Personnel Limited (NZBN 9429042464617) was incorporated on 15 Jul 2016. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 68 Russell Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 (type: office, postal). Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 03 Sep 2020. 200 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Critharis, Dean Constantine (a director) located at Kyle Bay Nsw postcode 2221. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (100 shares); it includes
Ayad, Maurizio (a director) - located at Caringbah Nsw. "Employment placement service (candidates and contractors)" (business classification N721130) is the classification the ABS issued Astar Personnel Limited. Our information was last updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
68 Russell Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 | Office | unknown |
Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 03 Sep 2020 |
Unit 30, 115 Woodpark Road, Smithfield, 2164 | Postal | 02 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean Constantine Critharis
Kyle Bay Nsw, 2221
Address used since 15 Jul 2016
Parramatta Nsw, 2150
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Parramatta Nsw, 2150
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 15 Jul 2016 - current |
Maurizio Ayad
Caringbah Nsw, 2229
Address used since 15 Jul 2016
55 Phillip Street, Parramatta, Nsw, 2150
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 15 Jul 2016 - current |
68 Russell Street , Westport , Westport , 7825 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 07 Aug 2020 - 03 Sep 2020 |
Suite 9, Level 6, 203 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 21 Feb 2020 - 07 Aug 2020 |
Suite 817, Level 8, West Plaza Building, 3 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 01 Nov 2019 - 21 Feb 2020 |
Floor 26, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2019 - 01 Nov 2019 |
Floor 27, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 16 Aug 2018 - 18 Sep 2019 |
68 Russell Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 | Registered & physical | 15 Jul 2016 - 16 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Critharis, Dean Constantine Director |
Kyle Bay Nsw 2221 |
15 Jul 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ayad, Maurizio Director |
Caringbah Nsw 2229 |
15 Jul 2016 - current |
Cass Trustees 2 Limited 68 Russell Street |
|
Cass Trustees 1 Limited 68 Russell Street |
|
The Quarry Restaurant Limited 68 Russell Street |
|
Dt Fitness Limited 68 Russell Street |
|
Perfection NZ Limited 68 Russell Street |
|
Cds West Coast Limited 68 Russell Street |
Interim Taskforce Limited 212 Tyntesfield Road |
Amanda Scott Consulting Limited 212 Tyntesfield Road |
Ts Solutions Limited 96 High Street |
Rural Exchange New Zealand Limited 21 Island Road |
1881 Migration Limited 17 Mayfly Lane |
Abraxas Limited 5 Drysdale Street |