Dtc Nz Bidco Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042532767) was incorporated on 25 Aug 2016. 6 addresess are in use by the company: Level 18, 125 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service). Suite 2, Level 1, 11A Litten Road, Cockle Bay Shopping Centre, Howick, Auckland had been their physical address, until 11 Dec 2019. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Dtc Bidco Pty Limited (an other) located at Sydney, Nsw postcode 2000. Businesscheck's information was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 6, 37 Moore Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Registered & physical | 11 Dec 2019 |
Suite 6, 37 Moore Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Postal & delivery | 09 Jul 2020 |
C/o Benestar Group Limited, Suite 6, 37 Moore Street, Howick, Aukland, 2014 | Office | 09 Jul 2020 |
Level 18, 125 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 20 Dec 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Charles Barrie Whattam
Euchareena, Nsw, 2866
Address used since 28 Feb 2023
Agnes Banks, Nsw, 2753
Address used since 30 Nov 2022 |
Director | 30 Nov 2022 - current |
Ryan Terry Rubinstein
Dover Heights, Nsw, 2030
Address used since 30 Nov 2022 |
Director | 30 Nov 2022 - 01 Mar 2023 |
Damien Peter Woods
Northwood, Nsw, 2066
Address used since 21 Aug 2019
Sydney, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 21 Aug 2019 - 30 Nov 2022 |
Bjorn Meier
Sydney, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Mosman, 2088
Address used since 18 Sep 2018 |
Director | 18 Sep 2018 - 27 Aug 2019 |
Michele Leslie Grow
Pyrmont, Nsw, 2009
Address used since 25 Aug 2016
Sydney, Nsw, 2000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 25 Aug 2016 - 05 Oct 2018 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 18, 125 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 20 Dec 2022 |
C/o Benestar Group Limited, Suite 6, 37 Moore Street, Howick , Aukland , 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 2, Level 1, 11a Litten Road, Cockle Bay Shopping Centre, Howick, Auckland, 1014 | Physical & registered | 13 Jun 2018 - 11 Dec 2019 |
48 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 25 Aug 2016 - 13 Jun 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dtc Bidco Pty Limited Other (Other) |
Sydney Nsw 2000 |
25 Aug 2016 - current |
Effective Date | 12 Apr 2017 |
Name | Zurich Insurance Group Ag |
Type | Company |
Country of origin | CH |
Address |
5 Blue Street North Sydney Nsw 2060 |
Masfen Nominees Limited Level 37, The Vero Centre |
|
Kaingaroa Investments Limited Level 22, Vero Centre |
|
Kaingaroa Timberlands Limited Level 22, Vero Centre |
|
Credit Corp New Zealand Pty Limited Level 22, Vero Centre |
|
NZ Financial Services Group Limited Level 22, Vero Centre |
|
Whale Bay Limited Level 22, Vero Centre |