Island Bay Limited (issued a business number of 9429043327669) was registered on 15 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 35 Khyber Road, Seatoun, Wellington, 6022 (type: registered, service). 26 Tai Paku Paku Road, Karaka Bays, Wellington had been their registered address, until 27 Apr 2023. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Thompson, Jon Lawrence (a director) located at Seatoun, Wellington postcode 6022. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Island Bay Limited. Our information was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
26 Tai Paku Paku Road, Karaka Bays, Wellington, 6022 | Physical | 28 May 2020 |
35 Khyber Road, Seatoun, Wellington, 6022 | Registered & service | 27 Apr 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jon Lawrence Thompson
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 17 Apr 2023
Karaka Bays, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 20 May 2020
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 19 Sep 2016
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 12 Oct 2018 |
Director | 15 Sep 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
26 Tai Paku Paku Road, Karaka Bays, Wellington, 6022 | Registered & service | 28 May 2020 - 27 Apr 2023 |
15/305 Evans Bay Parade, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 22 May 2018 - 28 May 2020 |
15/305 Evans Bay Parade, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 21 May 2018 - 28 May 2020 |
10 Brandon Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 15 Sep 2016 - 22 May 2018 |
10 Brandon Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical | 15 Sep 2016 - 21 May 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thompson, Jon Lawrence Director |
Seatoun Wellington 6022 |
15 Sep 2016 - current |
Auckley Limited Level 11-16 |
|
Hr Sorted Limited Level 16 |
|
Garrett Smythe Limited 10 Brandon Street |
|
Garrett Smythe Trustee Limited 10 Brandon Street |
|
Real Estate Investar Limited 10 Brandon Street |
|
Arvada Holdings Limited Level 16 |
Garrett Smythe Limited 10 Brandon Street |
Locfast Limited 10 Brandon Street |
Recuerdo Limited L15, 215 Lambton Quay |
Porirua Physiotherapy Centres Limited 38 Waring Taylor Street |
Legacy Development (2015) Limited L15, 215 Lambton Quay |
Murphy Street Properties Limited 107 Customhouse Quay |