Winders Investments Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429045987458) was incorporated on 01 Mar 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 11 Taylors Avenue, Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 (type: registered, physical). 712823 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 712823 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Holland, Annabel Mary (an individual) located at Bryndwr, Christchurch postcode 8052,
Letham, Nicholas James (an individual) located at St Albans, Christchurch postcode 8014,
Holland, John Lindsay (an individual) located at Bryndwr, Christchurch postcode 8052. The Businesscheck information was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Taylors Avenue, Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Mar 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Lindsay Holland
Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 01 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holland, Annabel Mary Individual |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 |
14 Jun 2024 - current |
Letham, Nicholas James Individual |
St Albans Christchurch 8014 |
13 Dec 2022 - current |
Holland, John Lindsay Individual |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 |
01 Mar 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woods, Andrew Nicholas Crosbie Individual |
Broadfield Christchurch 7678 |
01 Mar 2017 - 13 Dec 2022 |
Woods, Andrew Nicholas Crosbie Individual |
Broadfield Christchurch 7678 |
01 Mar 2017 - 13 Dec 2022 |
Winders Consulting Limited 11 Taylors Avenue |
|
Drm Enterprises Limited 3b Taylors Avenue |
|
Torchwood Limited 17 Chislehurst Place |
|
Advanced Guttering And Roofing Systems Limited 8 Chislehurst Place |
|
Rocking Horse Enterprises Limited 8 Chislehurst Place |
|
Finance & Equity Limited 23 Taylors Avenue |