Begin Bright Nz Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429046120236) was registered on 22 May 2017. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 8, 139 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service). Stanbeth House, Level 1, 28 Customs Street East, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 18 Jul 2023. Begin Bright Nz Limited used more names, namely: Visible Learning Plus Limited from 04 May 2017 to 28 Jun 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Cognition Education Limited (an entity) located at 139 Quay Street, Auckland postcode 1010. "Management consultancy service" (business classification M696245) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Begin Bright Nz Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Stanbeth House, Level 1, 28 Customs Street East, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 06 Nov 2019 |
Level 26, Hsbc Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 18 Jul 2023 |
Level 8, 139 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 16 Oct 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tina L.
Hobsonville, Auckland, 0618
Address used since 14 Apr 2022
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 03 Mar 2018
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 22 May 2017
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Feb 2019 |
Director | 22 May 2017 - current |
Sean Desmond Ryan
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 24 Aug 2022 |
Director | 24 Aug 2022 - current |
Aaron Smith
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 22 May 2017 |
Director | 22 May 2017 - 19 Jun 2018 |
Janet Clinton-hattie
Moonee Ponds, Victoria, 3039
Address used since 01 Jul 2017
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 01 Jul 2017 - 19 Jun 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Stanbeth House, Level 1, 28 Customs Street East, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 06 Nov 2019 - 18 Jul 2023 |
Level 2, Eden 1, 18 Normanby Road,, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Physical & registered | 22 May 2017 - 06 Nov 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cognition Education Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037563967 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
139 Quay Street Auckland 1010 |
22 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clinton-hattie, Janet May Individual |
Melbourne Victoria 3039 |
29 Jun 2017 - 19 Jun 2018 |
Effective Date | 31 Mar 2019 |
Name | Cognition Education Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 963400 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 2, Eden 1, 18 Normanby Road Mt Eden Auckland 1024 |
Corys Electrical Limited Level 1, 61 Normanby Road |
|
Peachgrove Studios Limited Mount Eden |
|
Terra Group NZ Limited Level 1, 40 Mt Eden Road |
|
Adhesion Limited Level 1, 110 Mt Eden Road |
|
Primesite Properties (1998) Limited Level 1, 29 Enfield Street |
|
Primesite Properties (1995) Limited Level 1, 29 Enfield Street |
Lagom Group Limited 27 Bellevue Road |
Wiremu Aporo Limited 8 Lovelock Avenue |
Morrison Engineered Solutions Limited 11a Prospect Terrace |
Five New Zealand Limited 2a Coles Avenue |
Tiaus Limited 24 Hillside Crescent South |
Hope Management Consulting Limited 14 Prospect Terrace |