Mareroa Consultancy Services Limited (NZBN 9429046130952) was registered on 15 May 2017. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 2 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (type: registered, service). Level 4, 17 Albert Street, Cbd, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 21 Feb 2018. 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 999 shares (99.9 per cent of shares), namely:
Blinman, Donna Elizabeth (an individual) located at Glen Eden, Auckland postcode 0602,
Liston Trustee Services 2020 Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010,
Mareroa, Shane (a director) located at Glen Eden, Auckland postcode 0602. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Mareroa, Shane (a director) - located at Glen Eden, Auckland. "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245) is the classification the ABS issued Mareroa Consultancy Services Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Rd, Grafton, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service & registered | 21 Feb 2018 |
2 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & service | 12 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shane Mareroa
Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602
Address used since 15 May 2017 |
Director | 15 May 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 17 Albert Street, Cbd, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 05 Feb 2018 - 21 Feb 2018 |
106 Captain Scott Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 | Physical | 15 May 2017 - 21 Feb 2018 |
106 Captain Scott Road, Glen Eden, Auckland, 0602 | Registered | 15 May 2017 - 05 Feb 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Blinman, Donna Elizabeth Individual |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 |
24 Jul 2023 - current |
Liston Trustee Services 2020 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048302180 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
24 Jul 2023 - current |
Mareroa, Shane Director |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 |
15 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mareroa, Shane Director |
Glen Eden Auckland 0602 |
15 May 2017 - current |
J A Davey Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |
|
Aquaknight Industries Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |
|
Mr White Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
|
Mjic Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
|
Cj Cafe Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Rd |
|
Country Treasures Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
The Value Exchange Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
Mccomish Business Services Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
Redward Associates Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |
Donald Purdon & Associates Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
Motu Management Limited Level 6, 57 Symonds Street |
Barclay Consulting Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |