Tin Tank Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429046146519) was incorporated on 25 May 2017. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 76 Fergusson Street, Feilding, Feilding, 4702 (type: registered, service). Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane had been their registered address, until 02 Jul 2024. 120000 shares are issued to 10 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0 per cent of shares), namely:
Hodgson, Cameron David (an individual) located at Rd 2, Taumarunui postcode 3992. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 40 per cent of all shares (exactly 47998 shares); it includes
Hodgson, Cameron David (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Taumarunui,
Wright, Campbell Cowan (an individual) - located at Rd 4, Taumaranui,
Hodgson, Tessa Pendreigh (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Taumarunui. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (71998 shares, 60%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Hodgson, Roderick James Lee, located at Rd 2, Taumarunui (an individual),
Johns, Mark Murray, located at Whangarei (an individual),
Hodgson, Elizabeth Anne, located at Rd 2, Taumarunui (a director). "Dairy cattle farming" (ANZSIC A016010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Tin Tank Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 | Physical | 25 Jul 2019 |
76 Fergusson Street, Feilding, Feilding, 4702 | Registered & service | 02 Jul 2024 |
76 Fergusson Street, Feilding, Feilding, 4702 | Registered & service | 16 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Elizabeth Anne Hodgson
Rd 2, Taumarunui, 3992
Address used since 25 May 2017 |
Director | 25 May 2017 - current |
Roderick James Lee Hodgson
Rd 2, Taumarunui, 3992
Address used since 25 May 2017 |
Director | 25 May 2017 - current |
Rod Hodgson
Rd 2, Taumarunui, 3992
Address used since 25 May 2017 |
Director | 25 May 2017 - current |
Cameron David Hodgson
Rd 2, Taumarunui, 3992
Address used since 31 May 2018 |
Director | 31 May 2018 - current |
Tessa Pendreigh Hodgson
Rd 2, Taumarunui, 3992
Address used since 31 May 2018 |
Director | 31 May 2018 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & service | 25 Jul 2019 - 02 Jul 2024 |
Level 1, 2 Commerce Street, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & physical | 25 May 2017 - 25 Jul 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Cameron David Individual |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
17 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Cameron David Individual |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
17 Jul 2018 - current |
Wright, Campbell Cowan Individual |
Rd 4 Taumaranui 3994 |
17 Jul 2018 - current |
Hodgson, Tessa Pendreigh Individual |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
17 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Roderick James Lee Individual |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
05 Jul 2022 - current |
Johns, Mark Murray Individual |
Whangarei 0171 |
25 May 2017 - current |
Hodgson, Elizabeth Anne Director |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
25 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Roderick James Lee Individual |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
05 Jul 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Elizabeth Anne Director |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
25 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Tessa Pendreigh Individual |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
17 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hodgson, Rod Director |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
25 May 2017 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Hodgson, Rod Director |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
25 May 2017 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Hodgson, Rod Director |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
25 May 2017 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Hodgson, Rod Director |
Rd 2 Taumarunui 3992 |
25 May 2017 - 05 Jul 2022 |
Pattersons Apparel Limited 160-162 The Strand |
|
Juberry Limited 158 The Strand |
|
Tumanako Hou Trust Whakatane 4 Canning Place |
|
Matahina F Trust Forests Limited 189 The Strand |
|
National General Services Limited Suite 2, 189 The Strand |
|
Bay Steel Contractors Limited Suite 1, 189 The Strand |
Tataiwhetu Farms Limited 5 Richardson Street |
Merivale Farms Limited 5 Richardson Street |
Ngati Awa Farms (rangitaiki) Limited 10 Louvain Street |
Pauperhaugh Dairy Limited 22 Louvain Street |
Riverlock Dairy Farm Limited 22 Louvain Street |
Brooklyn Dairy Farm Limited 22 Louvain Street |