Nikau Duncan Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429046178381) was incorporated on 09 Jun 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 6 Birdie Lane, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 (type: registered, physical). 20 Omaka Place, Aotea, Porirua had been their registered address, up until 10 Mar 2021. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Russell, Rachelle Elizabeth (a director) located at New Plymouth postcode 4312. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Russell, Hoani Tangira (a director) - located at New Plymouth. "Rental of residential property inactive" (business classification L671160) is the classification the ABS issued Nikau Duncan Limited. Our database was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Birdie Lane, Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rachelle Elizabeth Russell
Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 01 Aug 2021
Aotea, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 09 Jun 2017 |
Director | 09 Jun 2017 - current |
Hoani Tangira Russell
Waiwhakaiho, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 01 Aug 2021
Aotea, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 30 Jun 2020
Aotea, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 09 Jun 2017 |
Director | 09 Jun 2017 - current |
Rachell Elizabeth Russell
Aotea, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 30 Jun 2020
Aotea, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 09 Jun 2017 |
Director | 09 Jun 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
20 Omaka Place, Aotea, Porirua, 5024 | Registered & physical | 23 Jul 2019 - 10 Mar 2021 |
13 Abel Glen, Aotea, Porirua, 5024 | Physical & registered | 09 Jun 2017 - 23 Jul 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Rachelle Elizabeth Director |
New Plymouth 4312 |
09 Jun 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Hoani Tangira Director |
New Plymouth 4312 |
09 Jun 2017 - current |
Washee Limited 11 Able Glen |
|
L H Enterprise Limited 6 Abel Glen |
|
The Wellington Jet Sport Club Incorporated 4 Routeburn Avenue |
|
The New Zealand Professional Florists Incorporated 160 Eskdale Road |
|
South Pacific Solutions Limited 6 Routeburn Avenue |
|
Mau Trust 164 Conclusion Street |
Naca Enterprises Limited 17 Greenstone Place |
Beacon Hill Properties Limited 3 Tombane Terrace |
Perera Investments Limited 3 Tombane Terrace |
Silvereen Corporation Limited 3 Tombane Terrace |
Mano Property Company Limited 47 Halladale Road |
Bvhb Enterprises Limited 3 Aoraki Rise |