Island Pepe Limited (issued a business number of 9429046181886) was started on 26 Jun 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 385 Roscommon Road, Clendon Park, Auckland, 2103 (type: registered, physical). 246 Te Atatu Road, Te Atatu, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 25 May 2020. 2000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 250 shares (12.5 per cent of shares), namely:
Valikoula, Aloiafi Dora Desiree (an individual) located at Totara Heights, Auckland postcode 2105. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 12.5 per cent of all shares (exactly 250 shares); it includes
Valikoula, Fisiikaho (an individual) - located at Totara Heights, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (750 shares, 37.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Masoe, Jennifer Fang- Bo, located at Jimboomba, Brisbane/Qld (a director). "Baby wear retailing" (business classification G425105) is the category the ABS issued Island Pepe Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
385 Roscommon Road, Clendon Park, Auckland, 2103 | Registered & physical & service | 25 May 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jennifer Fang- Bo Masoe
Jimboomba, Brisbane/qld, 4280
Address used since 14 Jul 2022
Flagstone, Brisbane/qld, 4280
Address used since 01 Mar 2021
Milperra, Sydney/nsw, 2214
Address used since 22 Feb 2020
Pakuranga / Auckland, 2010
Address used since 26 Jun 2017
Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610
Address used since 01 Aug 2018 |
Director | 26 Jun 2017 - current |
Feliuai Masoe
Clendon Park, Auckland, 2103
Address used since 15 May 2020
Pakuranga / Auckland, 2010
Address used since 26 Jun 2017
Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610
Address used since 01 Aug 2018 |
Director | 26 Jun 2017 - current |
Fisiikaho Valikoula
Totara Heights, Auckland, 2105
Address used since 01 Jul 2018
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 26 Jun 2017 |
Director | 26 Jun 2017 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Aloiafi Dora Desiree Valikoula
Totara Heights, Auckland, 2105
Address used since 01 Jul 2018
Pakuranga Heights, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 26 Jun 2017 |
Director | 26 Jun 2017 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
246 Te Atatu Road, Te Atatu, Auckland, 0610 | Registered & physical | 19 Mar 2019 - 25 May 2020 |
246 Te Atatu Road, Te Atatu South, Auckland, 0610 | Physical & registered | 18 Mar 2019 - 19 Mar 2019 |
1/54 Reelick Avenue, Pakuranga / Auckland, 2010 | Registered & physical | 26 Jun 2017 - 18 Mar 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Valikoula, Aloiafi Dora Desiree Individual |
Totara Heights Auckland 2105 |
26 Jun 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Valikoula, Fisiikaho Individual |
Totara Heights Auckland 2105 |
26 Jun 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Masoe, Jennifer Fang- Bo Director |
Jimboomba Brisbane/qld 4280 |
26 Jun 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Masoe, Feliuai Director |
Jimboomba Brisbane/qld 4280 |
26 Jun 2017 - current |
Xuan Yan Yang Company Limited 58 Reelick Avenue |
|
Lightcraft Limited 7 Nan Place |
|
Amazing Grace International Limited 13 Nan Place |
|
Mike Feng Limited 13 Nan Place |
|
Fairlady Garage Limited Suite 1, 1 Canon Place |
|
Underground Chamber Inspections Limited 55 Reelick Avenue |
Baby Factory (n.z.) Limited 58 Stonedon Drive |
Ziwi Baby Limited 3 Limerick Place |
Scutch Cottage Limited 157 Point View Drive |
Auscas Construction Limited 67 Hamlin Road |
Umr Limited 411 Ellerslie-panmure Highway |
Readys Property Limited 6 Ballyholey Drive |