Ormiston Construction & Consulting Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429046278364) was incorporated on 04 Aug 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 176 Popes Road, Takanini, Takanini 2105, N Z, Papakura, 2105 (type: physical, service). 174 Popes Road, Takanini, Takanini 2105, N Z, Papakura had been their physical address, up until 01 Sep 2021. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 600 shares (60% of shares), namely:
Wardrope, Paula Lea (an individual) located at Takanini, Takanini postcode 2105. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40% of all shares (400 shares); it includes
Wardrope, Colin Lyall (an individual) - located at Takanini, Takanini. "Building consultancy service" (ANZSIC M692310) is the classification the ABS issued to Ormiston Construction & Consulting Limited. Our information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
68 Bayvista Drive, Karaka, Papakura, 2113 | Registered | 04 Aug 2017 |
176 Popes Road, Takanini, Takanini 2105, N Z, Papakura, 2105 | Physical & service | 01 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paula Lea Wardrope
Takanini, Takanini, 2105
Address used since 24 Aug 2021
Takanini, Takanini, 2105
Address used since 04 Aug 2017 |
Director | 04 Aug 2017 - current |
Colin Lyall Wardrope
Takanini, Takanini, 2105
Address used since 24 Aug 2021
Takanini, Takanini, 2105
Address used since 25 Aug 2020 |
Director | 25 Aug 2020 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
174 Popes Road, Takanini, Takanini 2105, N Z, Papakura, 2105 | Physical | 16 Aug 2017 - 01 Sep 2021 |
174 Popes Road, Takanini, Takanini 2105, N Z, Papakura, 2105 | Physical | 04 Aug 2017 - 16 Aug 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wardrope, Paula Lea Individual |
Takanini Takanini 2105 |
08 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wardrope, Colin Lyall Individual |
Takanini Takanini 2105 |
16 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Corse-scott, Paula Lea Director |
Takanini Takanini 2105 |
04 Aug 2017 - 08 Aug 2017 |
Raajiv Raahul Investments Limited 68 Bayvista Drive |
|
General Management Company Limited 68 Bayvista Drive |
|
Argus International Limited 68 Bayvista Drive |
|
Fairmall Investments Limited 68 Bayvista Drive |
|
One World Peace Maker Foundation Limited 68 Bayvista Drive |
|
Rugby Transfers International Limited 8 Bayvista Drive |
Dev Energy Services Limited 22 Andalusian Way |
Complete Check House Inspections Limited 61 Capriana Drive |
Meticulous Design Home Limited 23 Capriana Drive |
Protech Design Limited 50 Gatland Road |
Be Sure Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
Pdm Inspections Limited 33 Coles Crescent |