Fallon Trustees Limited (issued a business number of 9429032457360) was registered on 08 Dec 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 (type: physical, registered). 22 Scott Street, Blenheim had been their physical address, up until 29 May 2017. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Morgan, Geoffrey Mark (an individual) located at Rd 3, Blenheim postcode 7273,
Morgan, Annette Elizabeth (an individual) located at Rd 3, Blenheim postcode 7273. The Businesscheck data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Alfred Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered & service | 29 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Annette Elizabeth Morgan
Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273
Address used since 04 Nov 2021
Springlands, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 08 Nov 2011 |
Director | 08 Dec 2008 - current |
Geoffrey Mark Morgan
Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273
Address used since 04 Nov 2021
Springlands, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 08 Nov 2011 |
Director | 08 Dec 2008 - current |
Clayton Geoffrey Frazer Morgan
Rd 2, Blenheim, 7272
Address used since 04 May 2022
Rd 2, Blenheim, 7272
Address used since 04 Nov 2021
Springlands, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 08 Nov 2011 |
Director | 10 Jun 2010 - current |
Hadley James Morgan
Rd 2, Blenheim, 7272
Address used since 04 May 2022
Rd 3, Blenheim, 7273
Address used since 04 Nov 2021
Springlands, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 08 Nov 2011 |
Director | 10 Jun 2010 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered | 06 Sep 2016 - 29 May 2017 |
22 Scott Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Physical & registered | 05 Sep 2011 - 06 Sep 2016 |
Winstanley Kerridge Ltd, 22 Scott Street, Blenheim | Physical & registered | 01 Dec 2009 - 05 Sep 2011 |
Gm&ae Morgan, Oxley Apartments, 1 Wellington Street, Picton | Registered | 08 Dec 2008 - 01 Dec 2009 |
Oxley Apartments, 1 Wellington Street, Picton | Physical | 08 Dec 2008 - 01 Dec 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morgan, Geoffrey Mark Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
08 Dec 2008 - current |
Morgan, Annette Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 3 Blenheim 7273 |
08 Dec 2008 - current |
Wairau River Wines Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
8 Wired Brewing Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
Bryce Trustee Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
Alva Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
Crow Tavern Limited 2 Alfred Street |
|
G & S Moleta Trustee Limited 2 Alfred Street |