Oriens Capital Gp Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042183648) was started on 26 Feb 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 13477, Tauranga Central, Tauranga, 3141 (type: postal, office). Level 2, Regional House, 1 Elizabeth Street, Tauranga had been their physical address, up until 02 Mar 2017. 50585 shares are allocated to 26 shareholders who belong to 20 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 12510 shares (24.73% of shares), namely:
Custodial Services Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga postcode 3110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.99% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Tdc Business Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at Whangarei. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (500 shares, 0.99%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
De Vere, Philippa Anne, located at Ohauiti, Tauranga (an individual),
Lucas, Jennifer Anne, located at Karaka, Papakura (an individual),
De Vere, Warwick John Teed, located at Ohauiti, Tauranga (an individual). "Financial asset investing" (business classification K624010) is the classification the ABS issued to Oriens Capital Gp Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
53 Spring Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered & service | 02 Mar 2017 |
Po Box 13477, Tauranga Central, Tauranga, 3141 | Postal | 03 Mar 2020 |
53 Spring Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Office & delivery | 03 Mar 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Hugh Reginald Mcdonald
Ohope, Ohope, 3121
Address used since 26 Feb 2016 |
Director | 26 Feb 2016 - current |
Stephen John Napier
Rd 2, Tauranga, 3172
Address used since 27 Jun 2017 |
Director | 27 Jun 2017 - current |
Robert George Wyatt Stratford
Tauranga South, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 22 May 2023 |
Director | 22 May 2023 - current |
Emma Frances Gardiner
Bellevue, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 03 Apr 2024 |
Director | 03 Apr 2024 - current |
Taaringaroa Nicholas
Judea, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 26 Jun 2018 |
Director | 26 Jun 2018 - 03 Apr 2024 |
Andre Lyndon Settle
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 21 Nov 2022 |
Director | 21 Nov 2022 - 22 May 2023 |
Alexander Scott Hamilton
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 11 Aug 2020 |
Director | 11 Aug 2020 - 21 Nov 2022 |
Alexander Scott Hamilton
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 22 Feb 2018 |
Director | 22 Feb 2018 - 08 May 2020 |
Cassandra Rose Crowley
Hataitai, Wellington, 6021
Address used since 14 Dec 2016 |
Director | 14 Dec 2016 - 26 Jun 2018 |
Michael John Smith
Rd 2, Tauranga, 3172
Address used since 26 Feb 2016 |
Director | 26 Feb 2016 - 22 Feb 2018 |
Richard Charles Tauehe Jefferies
Rd2, Hamilton, 3282
Address used since 14 Dec 2016 |
Director | 14 Dec 2016 - 27 Mar 2017 |
Neil John Craig
Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 26 Feb 2016 |
Director | 26 Feb 2016 - 14 Dec 2016 |
53 Spring Street , Tauranga , Tauranga , 3110 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Regional House, 1 Elizabeth Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 26 Feb 2016 - 02 Mar 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Custodial Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038641053 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tdc Business Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042264613 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei 0110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
De Vere, Philippa Anne Individual |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Lucas, Jennifer Anne Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
De Vere, Warwick John Teed Individual |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wills Private Equity Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033677583 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Oratia Auckland 0604 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holm Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031409919 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Gregory Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bay Of Plenty Community Trust Inc Other (Other) |
Tauranga South Tauranga 3112 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Perry Securities Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030354388 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bronze Fronze Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041463338 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
K One W One (no 3) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030163089 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
4 Graham Street Auckland 1010 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tupu Angitu 2021 Lp Other (Other) |
Turangi Turangi 3334 |
17 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tect Community Trust Other (Other) |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elvin, Graeme Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Bougen, Lynda Ann Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Bougen, Alan John Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Saunders, Steven John Individual |
Rd 4 Tauranga 3174 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Te KĪwai Maui O NgĀruahine Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429043342907 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hawera Hawera 4610 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ceboh Partners Lp Other (Other) |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spijker, Aaltje Marijtje Individual |
Waihi Waihi 3610 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Mcdonald, Simon Paul Individual |
Rd 2 Katikati 3178 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Wiessing, Irene Marion Individual |
Rd 2 Katikati 3178 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Macrae, Ian Douglas Individual |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Quayside Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039147226 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Commercial Fund Investors Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041015063 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Bethlehem Tauranga 3110 |
10 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bell, David Warwick Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
26 Jul 2016 - 10 Feb 2017 |
Smith, Michael John Individual |
Rd 2 Tauranga 3172 |
26 Feb 2016 - 26 Jul 2016 |
Tinholt, Peter Paul Individual |
Matua Tauranga 3110 |
26 Jul 2016 - 10 Feb 2017 |
Taupo Moana Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035207429 Company Number: 1550553 Entity |
Taupo 3330 |
10 Feb 2017 - 17 Jul 2019 |
Taupo Moana Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035207429 Company Number: 1550553 Entity |
Taupo Taupo 3330 |
10 Feb 2017 - 17 Jul 2019 |
Craig, Neil John Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
26 Feb 2016 - 26 Jul 2016 |
Neil John Craig Director |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
26 Feb 2016 - 26 Jul 2016 |
Mcdonald, John Director |
Ohope Ohope 3121 |
26 Feb 2016 - 26 Jul 2016 |
Beale, James Noel Individual |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
26 Jul 2016 - 10 Feb 2017 |
Michael John Smith Director |
Rd 2 Tauranga 3172 |
26 Feb 2016 - 26 Jul 2016 |
Ea Gp Limited 53 Spring Street |
|
Ea Nominee Limited 53 Spring Street |
|
Enterprise Angels Incorporated 53 Spring Street |
|
Oriens Rg Nominee Limited 53 Spring Street |
|
Turning Point Trust 69 Spring Street (2nd Floor) |
|
Key Research Limited Anz Building |
Oriens Rg Nominee Limited 53 Spring Street |
Hillsdene Properties Limited 40 Wharf Street |
Tvb Investments Limited 2nd Floor |
Plus Group Horticulture Limited 247 Cameron Road |
Yeovil Investments Limited 41 Myres Street |
Sgk Investments Limited 41 Myres Street |