Headquarters Network Consultancy Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035575351) was started on 23 Jan 2004. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown, 9300 (type: registered, physical). 13 Camp Street, Queenstown, Queenstown had been their registered address, up until 15 Aug 2022. 1000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 200 shares (20 per cent of shares), namely:
Spijkerbosch As Executor To Estate Of Antonius Spijkerbosch, Erna May (an individual) located at Queenstown, Queenstown postcode 9300. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20 per cent of all shares (exactly 200 shares); it includes
Spijkerbosch, Erna May (an individual) - located at Queenstown, Queenstown. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (600 shares, 60%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Spijkerbosch, Uan Maarten, located at Queenstown, Queenstown (an individual). Our data was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
31 Dunmore Street, Wanaka, Wanaka, 9305 | Other (Address for Records) | 13 Nov 2015 |
18 Hylton Place, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 | Service & physical | 27 Jun 2022 |
Level 1, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered | 15 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Uan Maarten Spijkerbosch
Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 16 Jun 2022
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 28 Jul 2011 |
Director | 23 Jan 2004 - current |
Erna May Spijkerbosch
Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 22 May 2015 |
Director | 23 Jan 2004 - 16 Mar 2021 |
Antonius Hermanus Spijkerbosch
Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 22 May 2015 |
Director | 23 Jan 2004 - 16 Mar 2021 |
Simon Nicholas Hibbert
Ravensbourne, Dunedin, 9022
Address used since 09 Dec 2015 |
Director | 09 Dec 2015 - 22 Dec 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
13 Camp Street, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered | 27 Jun 2022 - 15 Aug 2022 |
18c Hylton Place, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 03 Nov 2021 - 27 Jun 2022 |
46 Robins Road, Queenstown, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 23 Nov 2015 - 03 Nov 2021 |
First Floor Spencer Mall, 31 Dunmore Street, Wanaka, 9305 | Registered & physical | 09 Jun 2014 - 23 Nov 2015 |
9 Cliff Wilson Street, Wanaka, 9305 | Physical | 06 Jul 2012 - 09 Jun 2014 |
9 Cliff Wilson Street, Wanaka, 9305 | Registered | 23 May 2012 - 09 Jun 2014 |
C/-whk, Level 1, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown 9300 | Registered | 04 Dec 2009 - 23 May 2012 |
C/-whk, Level 1, 13 Camp Street, Queenstown 9300 | Physical | 04 Dec 2009 - 06 Jul 2012 |
W H K Cook Adam Ward Wilson, First Floor, 50 Stanley Street, Queenstown 9300 | Registered & physical | 31 Jul 2007 - 04 Dec 2009 |
W H K Cook Adam, First Floor, 50 Stanley Street, Queenstown 9300 | Physical & registered | 16 Mar 2007 - 31 Jul 2007 |
54 Robins Road, Queenstown | Registered & physical | 23 Jan 2004 - 16 Mar 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spijkerbosch As Executor To Estate Of Antonius Spijkerbosch, Erna May Individual |
Queenstown Queenstown 9300 |
18 May 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spijkerbosch, Erna May Individual |
Queenstown Queenstown 9300 |
23 Jan 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spijkerbosch, Uan Maarten Individual |
Queenstown Queenstown 9300 |
23 Jan 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spijkerbosch, Antonius Hermanus Individual |
Queenstown |
23 Jan 2004 - 18 May 2023 |
Hibbert, Stewart David Individual |
Ravensbourne Dunedin 9022 |
11 Jan 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Hibbert, Simon Nicholas Individual |
Ravensbourne Dunedin 9022 |
11 Jan 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Roberts, Vernette Moana Individual |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9302 |
17 Dec 2012 - 04 Jun 2015 |
Gca Legal Trustee 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042148609 Company Number: 5876392 Entity |
Dunedin 9016 |
09 Mar 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Hibbert, Stewart David Individual |
Ravensbourne Dunedin 9022 |
11 Jan 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Gca Legal Trustee 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042148609 Company Number: 5876392 Entity |
Dunedin 9016 |
09 Mar 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Simon Nicholas Hibbert Director |
Ravensbourne Dunedin 9022 |
11 Jan 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Simon Nicholas Hibbert Director |
Ravensbourne Dunedin 9022 |
11 Jan 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Simon Nicholas Hibbert Director |
Ravensbourne Dunedin 9022 |
11 Jan 2017 - 15 Jan 2018 |
Queenstown Mountain Village Limited 54 Robins Rd |
|
Hadley Consultants Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Land Landscape Architects Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Fitzgerald Cove Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Robins Road Limited 44 Robins Road |
|
Wharehunga Forestry (2004) Limited 44 Robins Road |