Topp Twins Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429039116666) was registered on 01 May 1991. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 200 Wilson Road, Rd 1, South Head, 0874 (type: registered, physical). 200 Wilson Road, Rd 1, Helensville had been their registered address, up to 16 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Topp, Lynda Bethridge (an individual) located at Methven, Methven postcode 7730. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Topp, Julie Bethridge (an individual) - located at Rd 1, South Head. "Entertainer/celebrity management service" (ANZSIC M696215) is the category the ABS issued Topp Twins Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
200 Wilson Road, Rd 1, South Head, 0874 | Registered & physical & service | 16 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Julie Bethridge Topp
Rd 1, South Head, 0874
Address used since 08 Sep 2020
Rd 1, Helensville, 0874
Address used since 02 Sep 2016 |
Director | 01 May 1991 - current |
Lynda Bethridge Topp
Methven, Methven, 7730
Address used since 08 Sep 2020
Rd 1, Ashburton, 7771
Address used since 28 Aug 2009 |
Director | 01 May 1991 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
200 Wilson Road, Rd 1, Helensville, 0874 | Registered | 25 Mar 2020 - 16 Sep 2020 |
100 Wilson Road, Rd 1, Helensville, 0874 | Registered | 12 Sep 2016 - 25 Mar 2020 |
100 Wilson Road, Rd 1, Helensville, 0874 | Physical | 12 Sep 2016 - 16 Sep 2020 |
222 Rimmer Road, Rd 2, Helensville, 0875 | Physical & registered | 10 Sep 2010 - 12 Sep 2016 |
222 Rimmer Road, Rd 2 Helensville 1250 | Physical & registered | 14 Sep 2008 - 10 Sep 2010 |
29 Sherwood Avenue, Grey Lynn, Auckland | Physical | 08 Sep 2003 - 14 Sep 2008 |
Unit 7/386 Richmond Rd, Grey Lynn, Auckland | Physical | 25 Oct 2001 - 08 Sep 2003 |
21 Nottingham Street, Westmere, Auckland | Physical | 25 Oct 2001 - 25 Oct 2001 |
21 Mont Le Grand Raod, Mt Eden, Auckland | Registered | 01 Oct 1999 - 14 Sep 2008 |
21 Mont Le Grand Raod, Mt Eden, Auckland | Physical | 01 Oct 1999 - 25 Oct 2001 |
19 Emmolt Street, Herne Bay, Auckland | Registered | 04 Sep 1992 - 01 Oct 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Topp, Lynda Bethridge Individual |
Methven Methven 7730 |
01 May 1991 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Topp, Julie Bethridge Individual |
Rd 1 South Head 0874 |
01 May 1991 - current |
Caleb Jackson Contracting Limited 16 Shine Road |
|
Rotorsport Racing & Engine Balancing Limited 228 Wilson Road |
|
Paul Nasmith Builders Limited 41 Webber Road |
|
B&j Holdings Limited 96 Shines Rd |
|
Waioneke Transport Limited 422 Shelly Beach Road |
|
Grounds Maintenance & Control Limited 111 Te Kanae Road |
Shsl Entertainment Limited 278 Krippner Road |
Topline Entertainment Limited 63 Taupaki Road |
Fleapit Limited Cnr Baxter & Neville Streets |
Posh Styling Limited 52 Corricvale Way |
Icmi Speakers Bureau (nz) Limited 106a Bush Road |
Richard Lee Limited 14 Rakich Place |