Alistair Hool Marine Brokers Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041595015) was launched on 11 Feb 2015. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, physical). Unit 1 Z Pier 31 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 01 Aug 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
A & S Business Limited (an entity) located at Newmarket, Auckland postcode 1023. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Hool, Sophia Jennifer Kathryn (an individual) - located at Greenhithe, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Hool, Alistair Chadwick, located at Greenhithe, Auckland (a director). "Yacht broking" (ANZSIC G432020) is the category the ABS issued to Alistair Hool Marine Brokers Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 302791, North Harbour, Auckland, 0751 | Postal | 01 May 2019 |
Unit 1 Z Pier 31 Westhaven Drive, Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Office | 04 May 2021 |
Unit 1 Z Pier 31 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1011 | Delivery | 04 May 2021 |
Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alistair Chadwick Hool
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 11 Feb 2015 |
Director | 11 Feb 2015 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 6, 135 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Aug 2022 |
Unit 1 Z Pier 31 Westhaven Drive , Saint Marys Bay , Auckland , 1011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1 Z Pier 31 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1011 | Registered | 11 May 2022 - 01 Aug 2022 |
Unit 1 Z Pier 31 Westhaven Drive, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1011 | Physical | 12 May 2021 - 01 Aug 2022 |
4 Dene Court Lane, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 | Physical | 16 Mar 2018 - 12 May 2021 |
4 Dene Court Lane, Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632 | Registered | 16 Mar 2018 - 11 May 2022 |
627 Mt Wellington Highway, Otahuhu, Auckland, 1062 | Physical & registered | 11 Feb 2015 - 16 Mar 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
A & S Business Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051029203 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
26 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hool, Sophia Jennifer Kathryn Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
02 May 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hool, Alistair Chadwick Director |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
11 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hool, Sophie Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland 0632 |
18 Jun 2015 - 02 May 2018 |
Pacifikstar Limited 8 Dene Court Lane |
|
Greenop Trustees Limited 8 Dene Court Lane |
|
Albany Electronic Components Limited 5 Dene Court Lane |
|
Smoke Photography Limited 378 Upper Harbour Drive |
|
Whitewash Limited 378 Upper Harbour Drive |
|
Oasis Centre Trust 7 Dene Court Lane |
Hmarine Limited 23 Park Avenue |
Coast Marine Brokers Limited 29 Bella Vista Drive |
Te Ahu Marine Management Limited 19 Imogene Way |
Southpac Ventures Limited 12 Rosella Place |
Tetsmo Holdings Limited 19b Gwendoline Street |
Charterworld Limited Level 2, Building One |